ND HB1457 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to local disasters or emergencies.
Title
Local disasters or emergencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 25 |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |