ND HB1456 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 54-01-29.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the encouragement of federal legislation to return lands and mineral rights to the state.
Title
The encouragement of federal legislation to return lands and mineral rights to the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. William Kretschmar [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-04-08 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2015-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |