ND 1456 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 54-01-29.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the encouragement of federal legislation to return lands and mineral rights to the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The encouragement of federal legislation to return lands and mineral rights to the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16HouseSigned by Governor 04/15
2015-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-10SenateSigned by President
2015-04-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2015-04-08HouseConcurred
2015-04-07HouseReturned to House (12)
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7
2015-04-07SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-04-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2015-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2015-02-26SenateReceived from House
2015-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
2015-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1
2015-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2015-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback