ND HB1455 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 49-22-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to ten-year plans; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Ten-year plans; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |