ND HB1453 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 25-03.1-02, 25-03.1-07, 25-03.1-17, 25-03.1-21, and 25-03.1-30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to civil commitment procedures and alternative treatment orders; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Civil commitment procedures and alternative treatment orders; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] |
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/25 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 27 |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Appoint Rep. Paur to replace Rep. Paulson on conference committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Myrdal Dwyer Bakke |
2019-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Karls McWilliams Paulson |
2019-04-11 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |