ND 1452 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 54 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a clean sustainable energy authority and a clean sustainable energy fund; to amend and reenact sections 17-01-01 and 17-07-01 and subsection 5 of section 54-44.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to low-emission technology, the energy policy commission, and an exemption from procurement services for energy programs; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an appropriation; to provide a transfer; and to provide a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low-emission technology, the energy policy commission, and an exemption from procurement services for energy programs; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an appropriation; to provide a transfer; and to provide a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseSigned by Governor 04/26
2021-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-20SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 12
2021-04-16HouseConcurred
2021-04-13HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-13SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-04-13SenateAmendment failed
2021-04-13SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-04-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-04-05SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-03-26SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-26SenateAmendment adopted
2021-03-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-02-23SenateReceived from House
2021-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7
2021-02-19HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 0
2021-02-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-08HouseAmendment adopted
2021-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1452.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-05003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0904-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-64.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-67.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback