ND HB1450 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 62.1-04-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a license to carry a firearm or dangerous weapon concealed; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A license to carry a firearm or dangerous weapon concealed; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |