ND 1450 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-36-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an increase in the tobacco products tax rate for cigarettes; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An increase in the tobacco products tax rate for cigarettes; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 66
2019-01-24HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback