ND HB1448 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide free electronic access to state-funded research.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide free electronic access to state-funded research.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Joe Heilman [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Naomi Muscha [D] |
Rep. Robert Skarphol [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91 |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1448.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0759-01000.pdf |