ND 1447 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the display of a number plate on a motor vehicle owned by a collector.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The display of a number plate on a motor vehicle owned by a collector.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 30
2019-03-08SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2019-02-15SenateReceived from House
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2019-02-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback