ND 1442 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 47-16-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to late fees on rents under a rental agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Late fees on rents under a rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40
2021-03-22SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-22SenateReceived from House
2021-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 19
2021-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback