ND HB1440 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 38-11.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the protection of groundwater and other responsibilities of a mineral developer.
Title
The protection of groundwater and other responsibilities of a mineral developer.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Clayton Fegley [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |