ND HB1440 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 61-35-26.1, 61-35-26.2, 61-35-26.3, and 61-35-26.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water services by cities and water districts and state water commission policies on funds for water districts and cities.
Title
Water services by cities and water districts and state water commission policies on funds for water districts and cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Andrist J. Lee Dotzenrod |
2013-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Hofstad Froseth S. Kelsh |
2013-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-09 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |