ND 1439 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 44-06.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to remote notarial acts for clients of certain nonprofit organizations; to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 3 of section 44-06.1-13.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exemption for certain remote notarial acts; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An exemption for certain remote notarial acts; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 74
2021-02-11HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-25HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-01-25HouseRequest return from committee
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback