ND 1439 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-06-17.1 and 57-39.2-04.14, subsection 3 of section 57-51.1-03, and section 57-60-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a property tax exemption for pipelines used for secure geologic storage, a sales and use tax exemption for materials used for secure geologic storage, an oil extraction tax exemption for the incremental production from tertiary recovery projects using carbon dioxide, and property classification of secure geologic storage equipment for coal conversion tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A property tax exemption for pipelines used for secure geologic storage, a sales and use tax exemption for materials used for secure geologic storage, an oil extraction tax exemption for the incremental production from tertiary recovery projects using carbon dioxide, and property classification of secure geologic storage equipment for coal conversion tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/24
2019-04-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-19SenateSigned by President
2019-04-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10
2019-04-18HouseConcurred
2019-04-16HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-16SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2
2019-04-16SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-01-30SenateReceived from House
2019-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2019-01-29HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-28HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback