ND HB1439 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for a transfer from the general fund to the veterans' postwar trust fund.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for a transfer from the general fund to the veterans' postwar trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2013-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:20 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-02-13 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |