ND 1438 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 47-32-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the contents of a notice of intention to evict.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The contents of a notice of intention to evict.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 78
2021-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback