ND 1436 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-21-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to summer school courses; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summer school courses; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-08HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by President
2021-04-01HouseReturned to House
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-30SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2021-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-18SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-18SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee
2021-02-09SenateReceived from House
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-02HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback