ND 1436 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-35-02.4, 54-52.1-04, 54-52.1-04.2, and 54-52.1-04.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the employee benefits program committee, public employee uniform group insurance health benefits coverage, and to provide for a retirement board line of credit; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for application; and to provide statements of legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The employee benefits program committee, public employee uniform group insurance health benefits coverage, and to provide for a retirement board line of credit; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for application; and to provide statements of legislative intent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
2017-04-13SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-04-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-03-30SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-03-30SenateReceived from House
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 19
2017-03-29HouseAmendment adopted
2017-03-28HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-03-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-20HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback