ND 1435 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system health insurance benefits coverage for emergency responders who die in the line of duty; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees retirement system health insurance benefits coverage for emergency responders who die in the line of duty; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateSigned by President
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-03-31SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-03-15SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 18
2021-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback