ND 1435 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee Hearing 10:00
Pending: Joint Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 37-17.3-02, 37-17.3-02.2, and 37-17.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, and section 10 of chapter 247 of the 2017 Session Laws, relating to the governance, purchase, financing, and operation of the statewide interoperable radio network; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The governance, purchase, financing, and operation of the statewide interoperable radio network; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-02-27SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1
2019-02-12HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-12HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback