ND 1435 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-01-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school bond issue elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School bond issue elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
2017-03-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 17
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 4 5
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback