ND HB1434 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-12-26 and 15.1-12-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dissolution of school districts.
Title
Dissolution of school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19 |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |