ND 1433 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the direct sale of food by the producer to a consumer; and to amend and reenact sections 19-07-01 and 36-24-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the sale and production of animal-based products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The sale and production of animal-based products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 29
2017-04-07HouseConcurred
2017-03-29HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 10
2017-03-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 21
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback