ND HB1433 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hospital bad debt relief grants; to amend and reenact sections 57-36-25 and 57-36-26, subsection
Title
Allocation of tobacco products taxes and the health care delivery trust fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Sen. John Andrist [R] | Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87 |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-02-14 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |