ND 1432 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Pursuant to House Rule 319(6), HB 1432 lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-02, two new sections to chapter 15.1-21, and a new section to chapter 54-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of the superintendent of public instruction and other state officials and agencies, and to standards and assessments; to amend and reenact sections 15.1-02-04 and 15.1-21-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the duties of the superintendent of public instruction and professional development; to repeal sections 15.1-21-08, 15.1-21-09, 15.1-21-10, 15.1-21-11, and 15.1-21-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state assessments; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State assessments; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HousePursuant to House Rule 319(6), HB 1432 lost
2017-02-07HouseDivision B lost
2017-02-07HouseDivision A lost
2017-02-07HouseDivision of bill
2017-02-03HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback