ND 1431 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee Hearing 09:30
Pending: Joint Political Subdivisions Committee
Hearing: Mar 21 @ 9:30 am in Political Subdivisions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 61-24.5-03, 61-24.5-04, 61-24.5-07, and 61-24.5-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the parts of the state included in the southwest water authority and the membership of the board of directors of the southwest water authority; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The parts of the state included in the southwest water authority and the membership of the board of directors of the southwest water authority; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9
2019-02-15HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback