ND HB1430 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.6 and 15.1-21-02.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility requirements for the North Dakota academic and career and technical education scholarships.
Title
Eligibility requirements for the North Dakota academic and career and technical education scholarships.
Sponsors
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Claire Cory [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 49 nays 44 |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 3 1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 38 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |