ND 1430 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to failure to maintain control of a motor vehicle; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 and sections 39-06.1-09 and 39-08-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees for a moving violation and the use of a wireless communication device while driving; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees for a moving violation and the use of a wireless communication device while driving; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Governor 03/24
2017-03-22HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-22SenateSigned by President
2017-03-21HouseReturned to House
2017-03-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9
2017-03-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 23
2017-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback