ND HB1430 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-23-06.1 and 43-23-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions and the duties of real estate brokerage firms.
Title
Definitions and the duties of real estate brokerage firms.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Dave Weiler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/08 | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-24 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Received from House | |
2011-02-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8 | |
2011-01-28 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-27 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |