ND HB1430 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Nething A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 32-46 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to successor corporation asbestos-related liabilities.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Nething A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 32-46 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to successor corporation asbestos-related liabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-13 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-12 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-03-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 024 nays 022 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 003 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 01:00 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 01:00 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 053 nays 041 | |
2009-02-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Laid over 2 legislative days | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 006 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1430.html |