ND 1429 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-23-06, 15.1-23-11, and 15.1-23-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education standards; and to repeal sections 15.1-23-12, 15.1-23-14, and 15.1-23-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home education standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
2017-02-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback