ND HB1429 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-23-06, 15.1-23-11, and 15.1-23-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education standards; and to repeal sections 15.1-23-12, 15.1-23-14, and 15.1-23-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education standards.
Title
Home education standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |