ND 1428 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 61-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Missouri River council; to provide for the acquisition and management of the shoreline of the Missouri River; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Missouri River council; to provide for the acquisition and management of the shoreline of the Missouri River; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
2019-01-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 2 3
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback