ND 1427 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of refugee resettlement in North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of refugee resettlement in North Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/11
2017-04-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-04SenateSigned by President
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 19
2017-03-28SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-21SenateReceived from House
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5
2017-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback