ND HB1427 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 18-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to review of fire sprinkler system plans.
Title
Review of fire sprinkler system plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Ben Hanson [D] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 58 |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 2 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |