ND HB1427 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 030 nays 064
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 030 nays 064
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-05-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an injured worker's request for workers' compensation to exercise continuing jurisdiction.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-05-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an injured worker's request for workers' compensation to exercise continuing jurisdiction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 030 nays 064 | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 004 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1427.html |