ND 1426 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 43-11-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certification of niche beauty services providers; and to amend and reenact sections 43-11-01 and 43-11-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exemptions to regulation by the state board of cosmetology and definitions relating to the regulation of cosmetology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exemptions to regulation by the state board of cosmetology and definitions relating to the regulation of cosmetology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2021-03-23SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7
2021-02-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback