ND HB1426 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a credit enhancement program for political subdivision infrastructure funding; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A credit enhancement program for political subdivision infrastructure funding; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 1 |
2013-02-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |