ND HB1426 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Motion to reconsider failed
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Motion to reconsider failed
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Fischer, Flakoll, Horne A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 49-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the wind tower setbacks; and to provide for application.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Fischer, Flakoll, Horne A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 49-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the wind tower setbacks; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Kelsh [D] | Rep. Phillip Mueller [D] | Rep. Nelson [?] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Motion to reconsider failed | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 045 nays 047 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 008 n 005 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1426.html |