ND 1425 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 6-09-49.1 and a new section to chapter 21-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the legacy infrastructure loan fund and the state investment board; to amend and reenact sections 21-10-02 and 21-10-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state investment board and the legacy and budget stabilization fund advisory board; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The state investment board and the legacy and budget stabilization fund advisory board; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2021-04-06HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-31SenateSigned by President
2021-03-30HouseReturned to House
2021-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-26SenateLaid over one legislative day
2021-03-25SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-16SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-16SenateReported back, do pass 7 0 0
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8
2021-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 1
2021-02-11HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-11HouseAmendment adopted
2021-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-10HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback