ND 1425 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to protect the rights and privileges granted under the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to protect the rights and privileges granted under the United States Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 29
2017-03-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 30
2017-02-16HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 7 0
2017-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback