ND HB1425 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-20-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to compulsory attendance.
Title
Compulsory attendance.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] |
Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Rep. Kris Wallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 69 |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |