ND HB1425 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 54-21.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state building code.
Title
The state building code.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Rep. Gary Sukut [R] | Rep. Alon Wieland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-12 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-01 | Conference committee appointed Larsen Nodland Murphy | |
2011-03-31 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-18 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-17 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee | |
2011-02-18 | Received from House | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 | |
2011-02-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |