ND 1424 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 57-02-08 and section 57-02-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the property tax exemption for property of churches; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The property tax exemption for property of churches; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
2017-03-07SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 34
2017-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-08HouseReported back amended, without recommendation 10 4 0
2017-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback