ND 1422 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; to amend and reenact sections 5-01-09, 5-02-06, and 14-10-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The penalty for delivery of alcohol to an underage individual; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 10 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
2017-02-07HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 2
2017-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback