ND 1420 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 16.1-07-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to application for absentee ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application for absentee ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 75
2019-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2
2019-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback