ND 1420 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to enforcement of laws, rules, and regulations concerning the conservation of oil and gas; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement of laws, rules, and regulations concerning the conservation of oil and gas; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
2013-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 1
2013-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2013-01-21HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback