ND 1420 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-51.1-01, 57-51.1-02, 57-51.1-03, and 57-51.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil extraction tax rates and exemptions; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil extraction tax rates and exemptions; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
2011-02-09 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
2011-01-31 Committee Hearing 09:15
2011-01-17 Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback