ND 1419 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 19
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 40-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of a city to levy an infrastructure fee in lieu of special assessments; and to amend and reenact sections 11-09.1-05, 11-11-55.1, 40-05.1-06, 40-12-02, and 40-23-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of cities and counties to levy an infrastructure fee in lieu of special assessments and special assessment fund balances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The authority of cities and counties to levy an infrastructure fee in lieu of special assessments and special assessment fund balances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 19
2021-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback